بعد از این نور به آفاق دهم از دل خویش/ که به خورشید رسیدیم و غبار آخر شد

سرگرمی های ریاضی: یاكوب پرلمان، به توان 2 رساندن

نوشته شده توسط :آ نوری
1393/05/25-14:31

182 = 20*16 + 2^2 = 324,

37^2 = 40*34 + 3^2 = 1369,

48^2 = 50*46 + 2^2 = 2304,

54^2 = 58*50 + 4^2 = 2916.

To multiply 986 by 997, we do as follows:

986*997 = (986 - 3)*1000 + 3*14 = 983 042.

What is this device based on? Write the factors as

(1000 - 14)*(1000-3)

and then multiply the two binomials by the rules of algebra:

1000 * 1000 - 1000 * 14 -1000*-3 + 14*3

And now a few more manipulations give us

1000 (1000-14) – 1000*3 + 14*3

= 1000*986 -1000*3 + 14*3

= 1000 (986-3) + 14-3

The last line depicts the device that the calculator uses.

Here is a nice way of multiplying two three-digit numbers

in which the number of tens is the same, whereas the sum

of the units digits comes to 10. For example, to multiply

783*787

do as follows:

78*79 = 6162,  3*7 = 21

to get

616 221.





نظرات() 




درباره وبلاگ:



آرشیو:


طبقه بندی:


آخرین پستها:


پیوندها:


پیوندهای روزانه:


نویسندگان:


ابر برچسبها:


آمار وبلاگ:


ابزار دانستنی ها برای وبلاگ





The Theme Being Used Is MihanBlog Created By ThemeBox
 
شبکه اجتماعی فارسی کلوب | Buy Mobile Traffic | سایت سوالات